Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Ruvo

Dioecesis Rubensis

United

To: Diocese of Molfetta-Ruvo-Giovinazzo-Terlizzi



Show: All | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Historical Details


Past Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Ruvo (Ruo)(di Puglia)
6th CenturyErectedDiocese of Ruvo (Ruo)(di Puglia) (erected)
Diocese of Ruvo e Bitonto
27 June 1818UnitedDiocese of Bitonto
Diocese of Ruvo (Ruo)(di Puglia)
Diocese of Ruvo e Bitonto
30 September 1982SplitDiocese of Ruvo e Bitonto Diocese of Bitonto
Diocese of Ruvo
Diocese of Ruvo
30 September 1982SplitDiocese of Ruvo e Bitonto Diocese of Bitonto
Diocese of Ruvo
30 September 1986UnitedDiocese of Molfetta-Giovinazzo-Terlizzi
Diocese of Ruvo
Diocese of Molfetta-Ruvo-Giovinazzo-Terlizzi

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Ruvo e Bitonto
195086,80087,00099.8%755801,085510221ap1951
197070,20070,45799.6%526581,210718525ap1971
198079,85080,10299.7%446501,5971113026ap1981
Diocese of Ruvo

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.9, 26 Feb 2013; data: 9 Jun 2013