Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis-François Néel de Christot

Deceased

Bishop of Sées {Séez}, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1698¹Born
3 May 174042.3SelectedBishop of Sées {Séez}, France
11 Nov 174042.8ConfirmedBishop of Sées {Séez}, France
11 Dec 174042.9Ordained BishopBishop of Sées {Séez}, France
8 Sep 177577.6DiedBishop of Sées {Séez}, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Louis-François Néel de Christot
Bishop Louis-François Néel de Christot (born 1698, died ) Bishop of Sées {Séez}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRouen, Archdiocese of Rouen

  • a bishop for 34.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1740, Number 18
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 362

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast