Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François de Baglion de la Salle

Deceased

Bishop of Arras, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jun 1690Born
1718¹27.5Ordained PriestPriest
29 Oct 172535.3SelectedBishop of Arras, France
16 Dec 172636.4ConfirmedBishop of Arras, France
26 Jan 172736.5Ordained BishopBishop of Arras, France
14 Mar 175261.7DiedBishop of Arras, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for François de Baglion de la Salle
Bishop François de Baglion de la Salle (born , died ) Bishop of Arras

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLyon

  • a priest for 34.2 years
  • a bishop for 25.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 104
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1727, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast