Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edme Mongin

Deceased

Bishop of Bazas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jan 1668³BornBaroville
25 Sep 172456.7SelectedBishop of Bazas, France
29 Jan 172557.0ConfirmedBishop of Bazas, France
11 Mar 172557.1Ordained BishopBishop of Bazas, France
5 May 174678.3DiedBishop of Bazas, France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Edme Mongin:
Bishop Edme Mongin (born , died ) Bishop of Bazas

  • a bishop for 21.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 405

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013