Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Kwaku Afrifah-Agyekum

Bishop of Koforidua, Ghana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Dec 1954 Born
17 Jul 198328.5Ordained PriestPriest of Accra, Ghana
6 Jul 199237.5IncardinatedPriest of Koforidua, Ghana
12 Apr 200651.3AppointedBishop of Koforidua, Ghana
1 Jul 200651.5Ordained BishopBishop of Koforidua, Ghana

MicroData Summary for Joseph Kwaku Afrifah-Agyekum
Bishop Joseph Kwaku Afrifah-Agyekum (born ) Bishop of Koforidua

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAkimu Swedru

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Koforidua.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 12 Apr 2006
  • c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 186, Number 15,200

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast