Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Missionari di S. Giuseppe nel Messico

(Institute of Consecrated Life)

Societas Missionariorum a Sancti Joseph



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Institute of Consecrated Life
  • Founded: 19 September 1872
  • Clerical Religious Congregation
  • Mailing Address: Cerrada de Carracci 13, Apartado 19-243, 03730 Mexico, D.F., Messico
  • Telephone: (55)5563.3344; 5563.3675
  • Fax: 5598.0336

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
19 September 1872FoundedMissionari di S. Giuseppe nel Messico
20 August 1897Decretum LaudisMissionari di S. Giuseppe nel Messico
27 April 1903ApprobationMissionari di S. Giuseppe nel Messico

Statistics

YearReligious PriestsMale ReligiousParishesSource
1963224ap1964
196611823131ap1967
196711823131ap1968
197113222934ap1972
197413122038ap1975
197613220641ap1977
197713220641ap1978
198112718844ap1982
198612620957ap1987
199112624170ap1992
199513920968ap1996
2001133182ap2002
200212917662ap2003
200412618958ap2005
201011717047ap2011
201111615748ap2012
201211715944ap2013
201311816243ap2014
201412317143ap2015

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_d, v3.0.9, 4 May 2015; Data: 20 May 2015