Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Harold William Henry, S.S.C.M.E. †

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator of Cheju, Korea (South)

Titular Archbishop of Thubunae in Numidia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jul 1909Born
21 Dec 193223.4Ordained PriestPriest of Missionary Society of St. Columban
Oct 1954³45.2AppointedPrefect of Kwangju, Korea (South)
26 Jan 195747.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Corydala
26 Jan 195747.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Kwangju, Korea (South)
11 May 195747.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Corydala
10 Mar 196252.6AppointedArchbishop of Gwangju, Korea (South)
28 Jun 197161.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Cheju, Korea (South)
28 Jun 197161.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Thubunae in Numidia
1 Mar 197666.6DiedApostolic Administrator of Cheju, Korea (South)

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Harold William Henry (VIAF: 315684006)
Archbishop Harold William Henry S.S.C.M.E. (born , died ) Apostolic Administrator of Cheju

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNorthfield, Archdiocese of Saint Paul, Minnesota, USA

  • a priest for 43.1 years
  • a bishop for 18.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • ab/bp: CB, 27 Oct 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast