Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adrien-François Rouger, C.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Southern Kiangsi {Kiam-Si Meridionale}

Titular Bishop of Cisamus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Sep 1828BornMontmartins, France
1851¹22.3ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Mission
5 Jun 185223.7Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
19 Aug 187950.9AppointedPro-Vicar Apostolic of Southern Kiangsi {Kiam-Si Meridionale}, China
4 Sep 188355.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Southern Kiangsi {Kiam-Si Meridionale}, China
4 Sep 188355.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Cisamus
27 Apr 188455.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cisamus
31 Mar 188758.5DiedVicar Apostolic of Southern Kiangsi {Kiam-Si Meridionale}, China

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Adrien-François Rouger:
Bishop Adrien-François Rouger C.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Southern Kiangsi {Kiam-Si Meridionale}

  • a priest for 34.8 years
  • a bishop for 2.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 205

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013