Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paolo Rostagno

Deceased

Bishop of Ivrea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Apr 1883BornCastiglione Torinese
28 Jun 190825.2Ordained PriestPriest
5 May 193552.1AppointedBishop of Andria, Italy
4 Aug 193552.3Ordained BishopBishop of Andria, Italy
5 May 193956.1AppointedBishop of Ivrea, Italy
8 Dec 195976.7DiedBishop of Ivrea, Italy

MicroData Summary for Paolo Rostagno:
Bishop Paolo Rostagno (born , died ) Bishop of Ivrea

  • a priest for 51.4 years
  • a bishop for 24.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1935, Number 58

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013