Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Barbero

Deceased

Bishop of Vigevano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jun 1905Born
8 Jul 192823.0Ordained PriestPriest
26 Jul 195247.0AppointedBishop of Vigevano, Italy
7 Oct 195247.2Ordained BishopBishop of Vigevano, Italy
1 Apr 197165.7DiedBishop of Vigevano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luigi Barbero
Bishop Luigi Barbero (born , died ) Bishop of Vigevano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFoglizzo Canavese
Ordained BishopBorgo Masimo

  • a priest for 42.7 years
  • a bishop for 18.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1952, Number 90
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 75, Number 6,016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast