Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vittorio Bernardetto

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Susa, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Nov 1925Born
29 Jun 194923.6Ordained PriestPriest of Ivrea, Italy
31 May 197852.5AppointedBishop of Susa, Italy
7 Jul 197852.6Ordained BishopBishop of Susa, Italy
17 Sep 197852.8InstalledBishop of Susa, Italy
13 Dec 200075.0RetiredBishop of Susa, Italy
7 Mar 200175.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Susa, Italy

MicroData Summary for Vittorio Bernardetto
Bishop Vittorio Bernardetto (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Susa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastellamonte, Diocese of Ivrea
Ordained BishopCathedral, Ivrea, Diocese of Ivrea
Death PlaceCasa del Clero, Susa, Diocese of Susa
Buried Place (Original)Cemetery, Castellamonte, Diocese of Ivrea

  • a priest for 51.6 years
  • a bishop for 22.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Necrology (back)
  • c1/opd/loc: AM, 16 Sep 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast