Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicola Milone

Deceased

Bishop of Alessandria (della Paglia)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Oct 1872BornViù
13 Apr 189522.5Ordained PriestPriest of Torino {Turin}, Italy
21 Nov 192149.1AppointedBishop of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy
22 Apr 192249.5Ordained BishopBishop of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy
16 Jul 192249.8InstalledBishop of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy
11 Mar 194572.4DiedBishop of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy

MicroData Summary for Nicola Milone:
Bishop Nicola Milone (born , died ) Bishop of Alessandria (della Paglia)

  • a priest for 49.9 years
  • a bishop for 22.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1946
  • i: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1922, Number 10
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 45

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013