Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Agustín Alejo (Aleido) Román Rodríguez

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Miami, Florida, USA

Titular Bishop of Sertei


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 May 1928Born
5 Jul 195931.1Ordained PriestPriest of Matanzas, Cuba
6 Feb 197950.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Miami, Florida, USA
6 Feb 197950.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Sertei
24 Mar 197950.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sertei
7 Jun 200375.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Miami, Florida, USA
11 Apr 201283.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Miami, Florida, USA

MicroData Summary for Agustín Alejo (Aleido) Román Rodríguez
Bishop Agustín Alejo (Aleido) Román Rodríguez (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Miami

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Antonio de los Baños, Cuba

  • a priest for 52.7 years
  • a bishop for 33.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Website of the Diocese, 11 Apr 2012
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 16 Oct 2017