Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Tommaso Pio Cardinal Boggiani, O.P. †

Deceased

Chancellor of the Apostolic Chancery

Cardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Damaso

Cardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jan 1863BornBosco-Marengo
15 Sep 187916.7ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
22 Jul 188522.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
31 Oct 190845.8AppointedBishop of Adria, Italy
22 Nov 190845.8Ordained BishopBishop of Adria, Italy
9 Jan 191249.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Edessa in OsrhoŽne
10 Jan 191249.0AppointedApostolic Delegate to Mťxico
7 Mar 191451.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Genova, Italy
4 Dec 191653.9Elevated to Cardinal
7 Dec 191653.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Quirico e Giulitta
10 Mar 191956.1AppointedArchbishop of Genova, Italy
Aug 1921³58.5ResignedArchbishop of Genova, Italy
20 Jun 192764.4AppointedChamberlain (Camerlengo) of the College of Cardinals
17 Dec 192865.9ResignedChamberlain (Camerlengo) of the College of Cardinals
15 Jul 192966.5AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
13 Mar 193370.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Damaso
13 Mar 193370.2AppointedChancellor of the Apostolic Chancery
26 Feb 194279.1DiedChancellor of the Apostolic Chancery

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Tommaso Pio Boggiani:
Cardinal Tommaso Pio Boggiani O.P. (born , died ) Chancellor of Apostolic Chancery

  • a priest for 56.6 years
  • a bishop for 33.3 years
  • a cardinal for 25.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 38
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations …piscopales, Issue 1908, Number 66

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013