Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Werner Guballa

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Mainz, Germany

Titular Bishop of Catrum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Oct 1944Born
10 Oct 197025.9Ordained PriestPriest of Mainz, Germany
20 Feb 200358.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mainz, Germany
20 Feb 200358.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Catrum
21 Apr 200358.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Catrum
27 Feb 201267.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Mainz, Germany

MicroData Summary for Werner Guballa
Bishop Werner Guballa (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Mainz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMainz-Marienborn, Diocese of Mainz
Ordained BishopCathedral, Mainz, Diocese of Mainz

  • a priest for 41.3 years
  • a bishop for 8.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 171, Number 14,364
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 235, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast