Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Matteo Angelo Filipello

Deceased

Bishop of Ivrea, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Apr 1859Born
28 Oct 188122.5Ordained PriestPriest
24 Mar 189838.9AppointedBishop of Ivrea, Italy
8 May 189839.0Ordained BishopBishop of Ivrea, Italy
27 Jan 193979.7DiedBishop of Ivrea, Italy

MicroData Summary for Matteo Angelo Filipello (VIAF: 90367477)
Bishop Matteo Angelo Filipello (born , died ) Bishop of Ivrea

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastelnuovo d'Asti, Archdiocese of Torino {Turin}
Ordained BishopTorino, Archdiocese of Torino {Turin}

  • a priest for 57.2 years
  • a bishop for 40.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1937
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 324
  • b/c23: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1898, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Jun 2017