Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Battista Bertagna

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Torino {Turin}, Italy

Titular Archbishop of Claudiopolis in Honoriade


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Oct 1828Born
21 Dec 185022.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Torino {Turin}, Italy
14 Jun 185122.6Ordained PriestPriest of Torino {Turin}, Italy
24 Mar 188455.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Torino {Turin}, Italy
24 Mar 188455.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Capharnaum
1 May 188455.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Capharnaum
26 Mar 190172.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Claudiopolis in Honoriade
11 Feb 190576.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Torino {Turin}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Bertagna (VIAF: 258648329)
Archbishop Giovanni Battista Bertagna (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Torino {Turin}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastelnuovo d'Asti
Ordained BishopCathedral, Torino, Archdiocese of Torino {Turin}

  • a priest for 53.6 years
  • a bishop for 20.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 179, and Page 209
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1884, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 20 Apr 2017