Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Emilio Parodi, C.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Sassari, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Nov 1854Born
27 Mar 190550.4AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Sassari, Italy
27 Mar 190550.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Pessinus
7 May 190550.5Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Pessinus
10 Oct 190550.9SucceededArchbishop of Sassari, Italy
20 Dec 191662.1DiedArchbishop of Sassari, Italy

MicroData Summary for Emilio Parodi
Archbishop Emilio Parodi C.M. (born , died ) Archbishop of Sassari

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGenova, Archdiocese of Genova

  • a bishop for 11.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1917
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1905, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast