Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Francesco Alessandro Cagliero, I.M.C. †

Deceased

Prefect of Iringa, Tanzania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Feb 1875Born
4 Jun 189823.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Torino {Turin}, Italy
27 Mar 189924.0Ordained PriestPriest of Torino {Turin}, Italy
Jul 1903³28.3EnteredPriest of Consolata Missionaries
10 May 192247.2AppointedPrefect of Iringa, Tanzania
22 Oct 193560.6DiedPrefect of Iringa, Tanzania

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Alessandro Cagliero
Father Francesco Alessandro Cagliero I.M.C. (born , died ) Prefect of Iringa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastelnuovo d’Asti
Death PlaceMdandu, Tanganyika, Prefecture Apostolic of Iringa
Buried Place (Original)Tosamaganga, Tanganyika

  • a priest for 36.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Apostolische Nachfolge
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1931

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast