Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Spandre

Deceased

Bishop of Asti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jun 1853BornCaselle Torinese
26 May 187723.9Ordained PriestPriest
15 Sep 189946.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Torino {Turin}, Italy
15 Sep 189946.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Tiberias
28 Oct 189946.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tiberias
12 Jun 190956.0AppointedBishop of Asti, Italy
24 Oct 190956.3InstalledBishop of Asti, Italy
1 Apr 193278.8DiedBishop of Asti, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luigi Spandre:
Bishop Luigi Spandre (born , died ) Bishop of Asti

  • a priest for 54.8 years
  • a bishop for 32.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1931
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1933
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 552
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 70

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013