Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rozario Menezes, S.M.M.

Bishop of Lae, Papua New Guinea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Aug 1969 Born
31 May 199222.7ProfessedMember of Missionaries of the Company of Mary
4 Nov 199930.1Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Company of Mary
10 Oct 201849.1AppointedBishop of Lae, Papua New Guinea
15 Dec 201849.2Ordained BishopBishop of Lae, Papua New Guinea

MicroData Summary for Rozario Menezes
Bishop Rozario Menezes S.M.M. (born ) Bishop of Lae

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVirajpet, Karnataka, India
Ordained BishopGrounds of, St. Mary's Primary School, Lae, Diocese of Lae

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Lae.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 10 Oct 2018
  • ob: CB, 30 Oct 2018
  • 12.loc: CB, 12 Nov 2018
  • c2+: CB, 15 Dec 2018
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 238, Number 19,952

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast