Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Benedict To Varpin

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Madang, Papua New Guinea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jul 1936Born
24 Jan 197134.5Ordained PriestPriest of Rabaul, Papua New Guinea
30 Oct 197943.2AppointedBishop of Bereina, Papua New Guinea
19 Mar 198043.6Ordained BishopBishop of Bereina, Papua New Guinea
26 Jan 198750.5AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Madang, Papua New Guinea
31 Dec 198751.4SucceededArchbishop of Madang, Papua New Guinea
24 Jul 200165.0ResignedArchbishop of Madang, Papua New Guinea
8 Sep 202084.1DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Madang, Papua New Guinea

MicroData Summary
Benedict To Varpin
Archbishop Benedict To Varpin
(born , died )
Archbishop Emeritus of Madang

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVolavolo, Archdiocese of Rabaul
Ordained BishopVeifa'a
Death PlaceRabaul, Archdiocese of Rabaul

  • a priest for 49.6 years
  • a bishop for 40.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 61, Number 4,689
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 62, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • d: CB, 8 Sep 2020
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 246, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 28 Apr 2025