Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rolando Crisostomo Santos, C.M.

Bishop of Alotau-Sideia, Papua New Guinea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Mar 1949 Born
17 Jun 197122.2Perpetual VowsMember of Congregation of the Mission
1 Jun 197425.1Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
6 Apr 201162.0AppointedBishop of Alotau-Sideia, Papua New Guinea
3 Jul 201162.2Ordained BishopBishop of Alotau-Sideia, Papua New Guinea

MicroData Summary for Rolando Crisostomo Santos
Bishop Rolando Crisostomo Santos C.M. (born ) Bishop of Alotau-Sideia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMalabon, Rizal, Philippines

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Alotau-Sideia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 6 Apr 2011
  • ob/c2+: CB, 16 May 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 206, Number 17,087

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018