Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Robert Hoffman

Deceased

Bishop of Toledo (in America), Ohio, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jun 1932Born
28 Jul 195725.1Ordained PriestPriest of Toledo (in America), Ohio, USA
18 Apr 197845.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Toledo (in America), Ohio, USA
18 Apr 197845.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Italica
23 Jun 197846.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Italica
16 Dec 198048.5AppointedBishop of Toledo (in America), Ohio, USA
8 Feb 200370.6DiedBishop of Toledo (in America), Ohio, USA

MicroData Summary for James Robert Hoffman
Bishop James Robert Hoffman (born , died ) Bishop of Toledo (in America)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFremont

  • a priest for 45.5 years
  • a bishop for 24.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast