Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edward Gerard Hettinger

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Columbus, Ohio, USA

Titular Bishop of Teos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Oct 1902Born
2 Jun 192825.6Ordained PriestPriest of Columbus, Ohio, USA
6 Dec 194139.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Columbus, Ohio, USA
6 Dec 194139.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Teos
24 Feb 194239.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Teos
14 Oct 197775.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Columbus, Ohio, USA
28 Dec 199694.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Columbus, Ohio, USA

MicroData Summary for Edward Gerard Hettinger
Bishop Edward Gerard Hettinger (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Columbus

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLancaster

  • a priest for 68.5 years
  • a bishop for 54.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1942, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast