Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio de Hornedo Correa, S.J. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Chachapoyas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Sep 1915BornComillas, Spain
27 May 193317.6ProfessedMember of Society of Jesus
31 Jul 194933.8Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
6 Aug 196347.8AppointedPrefect of San Francisco Javier, Peru
24 Apr 197155.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Castellum Minus
24 Apr 197155.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of San Francisco Javier, Peru
15 Aug 197155.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Castellum Minus
9 Jul 197761.7AppointedBishop of Chachapoyas, Peru
18 May 199175.6RetiredBishop of Chachapoyas, Peru
10 Jan 200690.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Chachapoyas, Peru

MicroData Summary for Antonio de Hornedo Correa:
Bishop Antonio de Hornedo Correa S.J. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Chachapoyas

  • a priest for 56.4 years
  • a bishop for 34.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 202, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015