Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sebastián Ramis Torrens, T.O.R.

Prelate Emeritus of Huamachuco, Peru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jun 1943 Born
29 Jun 196926.0Ordained PriestPriest of Third Order Regular of St. Francis of Penance
13 Nov 199047.4AppointedPrelate of Huamachuco, Peru
13 Jan 199147.5Ordained BishopPrelate of Huamachuco, Peru
7 Aug 201875.1RetiredPrelate of Huamachuco, Peru

MicroData Summary for Sebastián Ramis Torrens
Bishop Sebastián Ramis Torrens T.O.R. (born ) Prelate Emeritus of Huamachuco

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLlubi, Spain
Ordained BishopHuamachuco, Territorial Prelature of Huamachuco

Please contact the Bishop through the Territorial Prelature of Huamachuco.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 126, Number 11,389
  • r: Bollettino, 7 Aug 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 7 Aug 2018

Quantcast