Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Erasmo Hinojosa Hurtado

Deceased

Archbishop of Piura


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Nov 1914BornParinacochas
1 Jan 193722.1Ordained PriestPriest
3 May 196146.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Piura, Peru
3 May 196146.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Boseta
11 Jun 196146.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Boseta
6 Jan 196348.1SucceededBishop of Piura, Peru
30 Jun 196651.6AppointedArchbishop of Piura, Peru
6 Aug 197762.7DiedArchbishop of Piura, Peru

MicroData Summary for Erasmo Hinojosa Hurtado:
Archbishop Erasmo Hinojosa Hurtado (born , died ) Archbishop of Piura

  • a priest for 40.6 years
  • a bishop for 16.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013