Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ersilio Menzani

Deceased

Bishop of Piacenza, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Dec 1872Born
29 Jun 189522.5Ordained PriestPriest of Bologna, Italy
16 Dec 192047.9AppointedBishop of Piacenza, Italy
25 Jan 192148.0Ordained BishopBishop of Piacenza, Italy
19 Mar 192148.2InstalledBishop of Piacenza, Italy
17 Nov 194572.8AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Piacenza, Italy
30 Jun 196188.5DiedBishop of Piacenza, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ersilio Menzani
Archbishop Ersilio Menzani (born , died ) Bishop of Piacenza

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMongardino, Sasso Marconi, Archdiocese of Bologna
Death PlacePalazzo Vescovile, Piacenza, Diocese of Piacenza
Buried Place (Original)Crypt, Cathedral, Piacenza, Diocese of Piacenza

  • a priest for 66.0 years
  • a bishop for 40.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1921, Number 6
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 9, Number 466, Ascendance
  • loc: AM, 10 Apr 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 10 May 2021

Quantcast