Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rómulo Betancourt y Torres

Deceased

Bishop of Campeche, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Feb 1858Born
21 Sep 188426.5Ordained DeaconDeacon
27 Sep 188527.6Ordained PriestPriest
31 Aug 190042.5AppointedBishop of Campeche, México
30 Nov 190042.7Ordained BishopBishop of Campeche, México
20 Dec 190042.8InstalledBishop of Campeche, México
21 Oct 190143.6DiedBishop of Campeche, México

MicroData Summary for Rómulo Betancourt y Torres
Bishop Rómulo Betancourt y Torres (born , died ) Bishop of Campeche

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIrapuato

  • a priest for 16.0 years
  • a bishop for .8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 176

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast