Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rafael Amador y Hernández

Deceased

Bishop of Huajuapan de León, Oaxaca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Feb 1856BornChila
19 Sep 188529.6Ordained PriestPriest
27 Mar 190347.2AppointedBishop of Mixtecas, Oaxaca, México
29 Jun 190347.4Ordained BishopBishop of Mixtecas, Oaxaca, México
9 Aug 190347.5InstalledBishop of Mixtecas, Oaxaca, México
3 Jun 192367.3DiedBishop of Huajuapan de León, Oaxaca, México

MicroData Summary for Rafael Amador y Hernández:
Bishop Rafael Amador y Hernández (born , died ) Bishop of Huajuapan de León

  • a priest for 37.7 years
  • a bishop for 19.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Number 16,033
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1903, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013