Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Bertoua

Archidioecesis Bertuanus



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Joseph Atanga, S.J., Archbishop
  • Roger Pirenne, C.I.C.M., Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 11 November 1994
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Cameroon
  • Square Kilometers: 26,320 (10,166 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://archidiocesbertoua.org/
  • Mailing Address: Archeveche, B.P. 40, Bertoua, Cameroun
  • Telephone: 2224.17.48
  • Fax: 2224.25.85

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Bertoua
17 March 1983ErectedDiocese of Doumé Diocese of Bertoua (erected)
20 May 1991Territory LostDiocese of Bertoua Diocese of Yokadouma (erected)
3 February 1994Territory LostDiocese of Bertoua Diocese of Batouri (erected)
Archdiocese of Bertoua
11 November 1994ElevatedDiocese of Bertoua Archdiocese of Bertoua

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Bertoua
199076,850352,50021.8%1319322,401366217ap1991
Archdiocese of Bertoua
199971,463225,13531.7%1412262,748224314ap2000
200082,724234,97535.2%149233,596194014ap2001
200182,900245,15033.8%1412263,188224715ap2002
200283,525254,27532.8%149233,631204717ap2003
200385,278284,67830.0%258332,584255918ap2004
2004101,154308,87532.7%259342,975244319ap2005
2006121,204314,00038.6%3212442,754296518ap2007
2012129,000345,00037.4%609691,869196537ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 9 Sep 2013