Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Faustin Ambassa Ndjodo, C.I.C.M.

Bishop of Batouri


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jul 1964 BornEkouda
26 Jul 199733.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
3 Dec 200945.4AppointedBishop of Batouri, Cameroon
31 Jan 201045.5Ordained BishopBishop of Batouri, Cameroon

MicroData Summary for Faustin Ambassa Ndjodo:
Bishop Faustin Ambassa Ndjodo C.I.C.M. (born ) Bishop of Batouri

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Batouri.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 Dec 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2011, Page 90
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,562

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013