Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dieudonné Espoir Atangana

Bishop of Nkongsamba, Cameroon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Mar 1958 Born
21 Jun 198628.2Ordained PriestPriest of Yaoundé, Cameroon
3 Jul 198729.2IncardinatedPriest of Obala, Cameroon
26 May 201254.1AppointedBishop of Nkongsamba, Cameroon
14 Jul 201254.3Ordained BishopBishop of Nkongsamba, Cameroon

MicroData Summary for Dieudonné Espoir Atangana
Bishop Dieudonné Espoir Atangana (born ) Bishop of Nkongsamba

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNgongo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Nkongsamba.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 26 May 2012
  • ob: CB, 14 Jun 2012
  • c2: CB, 29 Jun 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Number 17,502

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast