Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Armando Esteves Domingues

Auxiliary Bishop of Porto, Portugal

Titular Bishop of Centenaria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Mar 1957 Born
13 Jan 198224.8Ordained PriestPriest of Viseu, Portugal
27 Oct 201861.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Porto, Portugal
27 Oct 201861.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Centenaria
16 Dec 201861.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Centenaria

MicroData Summary for Armando Esteves Domingues
Bishop Armando Esteves Domingues (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Porto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOleiros
Ordained BishopCathedral, Viseu, Diocese of Viseu

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Porto.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 27 Oct 2018
  • ob: CB, 27 Oct 2018
  • c2+: CB, 16 Dec 2018
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 238, Number 19,956

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast