Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michele De Rosa

Bishop Emeritus of Cerreto Sannita-Telese-Sant’Agata de’ Goti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Nov 1940 BornAcerno
29 Jun 196423.6Ordained PriestPriest of Salerno (-Acerno), Italy
23 May 199857.5AppointedBishop of Cerreto Sannita-Telese-Sant’Agata de’ Goti, Italy
12 Jul 199857.6Ordained BishopBishop of Cerreto Sannita-Telese-Sant’Agata de’ Goti, Italy
24 Jun 201675.6RetiredBishop of Cerreto Sannita-Telese-Sant’Agata de’ Goti, Italy

MicroData Summary for Michele De Rosa (VIAF: 43487261)
Bishop Michele De Rosa (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Cerreto Sannita-Telese-Sant’Agata de’ Goti

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Cerreto Sannita-Telese-Sant’Agata de’ Goti.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Number 13,355
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 24 Jun 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 4 Sep 2016