Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luiz Antônio Guedes

Bishop of Campo Limpo, Sao Paulo, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Nov 1945 Born
20 May 197226.4Ordained PriestPriest of Campinas, Sao Paulo, Brazil
29 Jan 199751.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Campinas, Sao Paulo, Brazil
29 Jan 199751.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Maturba
9 Mar 199751.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Maturba
24 Oct 200155.9AppointedBishop of Bauru, Sao Paulo, Brazil
30 Jul 200862.6AppointedBishop of Campo Limpo, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Luiz Antônio Guedes
Bishop Luiz Antônio Guedes (born ) Bishop of Campo Limpo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMogi Mirim

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Campo Limpo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 30 Jul 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Number 12,933

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 17 Jul 2017