Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop David Picão

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Santos, Sao Paulo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Aug 1923BornRibeirão Prêto
10 Oct 194825.1Ordained PriestPriest
14 May 196036.7AppointedBishop of São João da Boa Vista, Sao Paulo, Brazil
31 Jul 196037.0Ordained BishopBishop of São João da Boa Vista, Sao Paulo, Brazil
10 May 196339.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Santos, Sao Paulo, Brazil
10 May 196339.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Thois
22 Jun 196339.8InstalledTitular Bishop of Thois
21 Nov 196643.3SucceededBishop of Santos, Sao Paulo, Brazil
26 Jul 200076.9RetiredBishop of Santos, Sao Paulo, Brazil
30 Apr 200985.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Santos, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for David Picão:
Bishop David Picão (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Santos

  • a priest for 60.6 years
  • a bishop for 48.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1960, Number 84
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013