Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco José Zugliani

Bishop Emeritus of Amparo, Sao Paulo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 May 1934 BornMineiros do Tietê
9 Jul 196127.2Ordained PriestPriest of São Carlos, Sao Paulo, Brazil
23 Dec 199763.6AppointedBishop of Amparo, Sao Paulo, Brazil
18 Mar 199863.9Ordained BishopBishop of Amparo, Sao Paulo, Brazil
14 Jul 201076.2RetiredBishop of Amparo, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Francisco José Zugliani:
Bishop Francisco José Zugliani (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Amparo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Amparo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c1: CB
  • r: Bollettino, 14 Jul 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Number 13,250

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013