Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Pérez-Gil y González

Deceased

Bishop of Tlalnepantla, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jan 1921BornMorelia
10 Apr 194322.2Ordained PriestPriest
18 Jul 196645.5AppointedBishop of Mexicali, Baja California Norte, México
18 Oct 196645.8Ordained BishopBishop of Mexicali, Baja California Norte, México
30 Mar 198463.2AppointedBishop of Tlalnepantla, México, México
2 Jun 198463.4InstalledBishop of Tlalnepantla, México, México
17 Jun 198968.4AppointedArchbishop of Tlalnepantla, México, México
14 Feb 199675.1DiedArchbishop of Tlalnepantla, México, México

MicroData Summary for Manuel Pérez-Gil y González:
Bishop Manuel Pérez-Gil y González (born , died ) Bishop of Tlalnepantla

  • a priest for 52.8 years
  • a bishop for 29.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013