Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José Guadalupe Martín Rábago

Archbishop Emeritus of León, Guanajuato


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Oct 1935 BornSan Miguel El Alto
22 Jul 196226.7Ordained PriestPriest
15 Apr 199256.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
15 Apr 199256.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Tuscamia
5 Jun 199256.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tuscamia
23 Aug 199559.8AppointedBishop of León, Guanajuato, México
18 Oct 199560.0InstalledBishop of León, Guanajuato, México
25 Nov 200671.1AppointedArchbishop of León, Guanajuato, México
22 Dec 201277.1RetiredArchbishop of León, Guanajuato, México

MicroData Summary for José Guadalupe Martín Rábago:
Archbishop José Guadalupe Martín Rábago (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of León

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of León.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 131, Number 11,777
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134
  • r: Bollettino, 22 Dec 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 23 May 2015