Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Onésimo Cepeda Silva

Bishop Emeritus of Ecatepec, México, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Mar 1937 Born
28 Oct 197033.5Ordained PriestPriest
28 Jun 199558.2AppointedBishop of Ecatepec, México, México
12 Aug 199558.3Ordained BishopBishop of Ecatepec, México, México
7 May 201275.1RetiredBishop of Ecatepec, México, México

MicroData Summary for Onésimo Cepeda Silva
Bishop Onésimo Cepeda Silva (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Ecatepec

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMéxico

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ecatepec.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143, Number 12,601
  • r: Bollettino, 7 May 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast