Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Tijuana

Archidioecesis Tigiuanaënsis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Rafael Romo Muñoz, Archbishop

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 25 November 2006
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Baja California Norte
  • Country: México
  • Square Kilometers: 24,962 (9,641 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Noroeste
  • Official Web Site: http://www.iglesiatijuana.org/
  • Mailing Address: Arzobispado, Calle Décima y Av. Ocampo 8585, 22000 Tijuana, B.C.N., México
  • Telephone: (664)684-8411
  • Fax: 684-7683

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of California Inferiore
20 January 1874ErectedArchdiocese of México Vicariate Apostolic of California Inferiore (erected)
13 April 1957Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of California Inferiore Prefecture Apostolic of La Paz en la Baja California Sur (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Tijuana
13 July 1957Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of California Inferiore Vicariate Apostolic of Tijuana
25 March 1966Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Tijuana Diocese of Mexicali (erected)
Diocese of Tijuana
13 July 1963ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Tijuana Diocese of Tijuana
Archdiocese of Tijuana
25 November 2006ElevatedDiocese of Tijuana Archdiocese of Tijuana
26 January 2007Territory LostDiocese of Mexicali
Archdiocese of Tijuana
Diocese of Ensenada (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of California Inferiore
1950285,000300,00095.0%1231436,6275317021ap1951
Vicariate Apostolic of Tijuana
Diocese of Tijuana
1965625,000650,00096.2%5228807,8123744924ap1967
1970508,250535,00095.0%434311,81929727ap1971
1976675,000730,00092.5%5535907,50024735625ap1977
1980965,0001,057,00091.3%53298211,76824033534ap1981
19901,788,0001,925,00092.9%975315011,920210838847ap1991
19992,778,4202,985,76793.1%1347020413,619215656282ap2000
20002,570,0002,770,00092.8%1377721412,009415158685ap2001
20012,600,8882,800,88892.9%1347821212,2681218252188ap2002
20022,631,3772,894,51490.9%1407521512,2381213652093ap2003
20032,475,3972,912,23285.0%1427922111,2001214854897ap2004
20042,755,7762,900,00095.0%1827826010,59911161575106ap2005
Archdiocese of Tijuana
20102,170,0002,284,00095.0%1506421410,1401112543095ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 8 Dec 2013