Date | Age | Event | Title |
---|---|---|---|
20 Jun 1970 | Born | ||
25 Apr 1998 | 27.8 | Ordained Priest | Priest of Los Teques, Venezuela |
25 Mar 2024 | 53.7 | Appointed | Bishop of Puerto Cabello, Venezuela |
6 Jul 2024 | 54.0 | Ordained Bishop | Bishop of Puerto Cabello, Venezuela |
3 Aug 2024 | 54.1 | Installed | Bishop of Puerto Cabello, Venezuela |
(WikiData: Q125140925)
Father
José Antonio
Da Conceição Ferreira
(born )
Bishop-Elect
of Puerto Cabello
Event | Place |
---|---|
Birth Place | Caracas, Archdiocese of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela |
Ordained Bishop | Nuestra Señora de Fátima, Shrine, Carrizal, Diocese of Los Teques |
Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Puerto Cabello.
|
|
Source(s):
|
Home |
Countries |
Religious Orders |
Popes |
Holy See |
Roman Curia |
Cardinals by Rank
| ||
About Catholic-Hierarchy | Terminology/Site Help | |
Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024 Code: web_b, v3.3.5, 31 Dec 2023; Data: 19 Apr 2024 |
✠