Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Enrique Delgado Silva

Bishop of Cabimas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Feb 1951 BornCaracas
18 May 197524.2Ordained PriestPriest
3 Nov 199544.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Maracaibo, Venezuela
3 Nov 199544.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Vazi-Sarra
16 Dec 199544.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vazi-Sarra
14 Apr 199948.1AppointedBishop of El Vigia-San Carlos del Zulia, Venezuela
19 Jun 199948.3InstalledBishop of El Vigia-San Carlos del Zulia, Venezuela
26 Jul 200554.4AppointedBishop of Cabimas, Venezuela

MicroData Summary for William Enrique Delgado Silva:
Bishop William Enrique Delgado Silva (born ) Bishop of Cabimas

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Cabimas.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143, Number 12,634

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013