Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Freddy Jesús Fuenmayor Suárez

Bishop of Los Teques


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Nov 1949 BornMaracaibo
3 Apr 197626.4Ordained PriestPriest of Los Teques, Venezuela
12 Mar 199444.3AppointedBishop of Cabimas, Venezuela
23 Apr 199444.5Ordained BishopBishop of Cabimas, Venezuela
30 Dec 200455.1AppointedBishop of Los Teques, Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Freddy Jesús Fuenmayor Suárez:
Bishop Freddy Jesús Fuenmayor Suárez (born ) Bishop of Los Teques

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Los Teques.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 139, Number 12,342

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013