Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Helizandro Emiro Terán Bermúdez, O.S.A.

Bishop of Ciudad Guayana, Venezuela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jun 1965 Born
23 Dec 199429.5Solemn VowsMember of Order of St. Augustine
9 Sep 199530.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of St. Augustine
29 Jul 201752.1AppointedBishop of Ciudad Guayana, Venezuela
23 Sep 201752.2Ordained BishopBishop of Ciudad Guayana, Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Helizandro Emiro Terán Bermúdez
Bishop Helizandro Emiro Terán Bermúdez O.S.A. (born ) Bishop of Ciudad Guayana

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMaracaibo, Archdiocese of Maracaibo
Ordained PriestNtra. Sra. Del Perpetuo Socorro, Church, Maracaibo, Archdiocese of Maracaibo
Ordained BishopN. Sra. de Coromoto de El Paraíso, Caracas, Archdiocese of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ciudad Guayana.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 29 Jul 2017
  • ob/c2+: CB, 5 Aug 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 24 Sep 2017