Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis Pelâtre, A.A.

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Istanbul

Titular Bishop of Sasima


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 May 1940 BornPancé, France
15 Sep 196222.3ProfessedMember of Augustinians of the Assumption
24 May 196929.0Ordained PriestPriest of Augustinians of the Assumption
9 Jul 199252.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Istanbul, Turkey
9 Jul 199252.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Sasima
13 Sep 199252.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sasima
1999²58.6AppointedApostolic Administrator of Istanbul (Constantinople) (Greek), Turkey
16 Apr 201675.9RetiredVicar Apostolic of Istanbul, Turkey
16 Apr 201675.9RetiredApostolic Administrator of Istanbul (Constantinople) (Greek), Turkey

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Louis Pelâtre
Bishop Louis Pelâtre A.A. (born ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Istanbul

Please contact the Bishop through the Vicariate Apostolic of Istanbul.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,924
  • r: Bollettino, 16 Apr 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 16 Apr 2016