Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antónios Varthalítis, A.A. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Corfù, Zante e Cefalonia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1924BornVaris
11 Jan 195329.0Ordained PriestPriest of Augustinians of the Assumption
30 May 196238.4AppointedArchbishop of Corfù, Zante e Cefalonia, Greece
5 Aug 196238.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Corfù, Zante e Cefalonia, Greece
22 Mar 200379.2RetiredArchbishop of Corfù, Zante e Cefalonia, Greece
27 Oct 200783.8DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Corfù, Zante e Cefalonia, Greece

MicroData Summary for Antónios Varthalítis:
Archbishop Antónios Varthalítis A.A. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Corfù, Zante e Cefalonia

  • a priest for 54.8 years
  • a bishop for 45.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 114
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 12 Aug 2014