Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Hovhannes Tcholakian

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Istanbul (Armenian), Turkey


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Apr 1919Born
25 Apr 194324.0Ordained PriestPriest of Istanbul (Armenian), Turkey
23 May 196647.1SelectedArchbishop of Istanbul (Armenian), Turkey
16 Jan 196747.7ConfirmedArchbishop of Istanbul (Armenian), Turkey
5 Mar 196747.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Istanbul (Armenian), Turkey
21 Mar 201595.9RetiredArchbishop of Istanbul (Armenian), Turkey
16 Sep 201697.4DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Istanbul (Armenian), Turkey

MicroData Summary for Hovhannes Tcholakian (VIAF: 34633629)
Archbishop Hovhannes Tcholakian (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Istanbul

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIstanbul
Death PlaceAcibadem Taksim hospital, Istanbul, Archeparchy of Istanbul (Armenian)

  • a priest for 73.3 years
  • a bishop for 49.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 21 Mar 2015
  • d: CB, 17 Sep 2016
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 16 Jan 2017